Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retiree Benefits - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Carey, Attar, Bhandari, Bridges, Bromwell, Busch, Cardin, Crosby, Hettleman, Jones, Kipke, Lafferty, McIntosh, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Stein, Szeliga, and C. Watson
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing retirees who participate in a certain prescription drug benefit plan to elect to have a spouse or dependent child covered under a certain State plan; requiring the Department of Budget and Management, on or before January 1, 2020, to establish the Maryland State Retiree Prescription Drug Coverage Program that reimburses participants for out-of-pocket costs that exceed certain limits; requiring the Department to establish a Maryland State Retiree Life-Sustaining Prescription Drug Assistance Program; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0946
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retiree Benefits - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824568/1
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824568/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retiree Benefits - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-9)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {759335/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retiree Benefits - Revisions
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {824568/1 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {824568/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retiree Benefits - Revisions
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (120-9) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Referred Rules 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {759335/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
(   2-508, 2-509, 2-509.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page