Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual to resume participation in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection in the Employees' Pension System or Teachers' Pension System if the individual has been separated from employment for more than 4 years, has, by a specified date, accrued the minimum amount of eligibility service needed to be eligible for a vested allowance, and has returned, by June 30, 2016, to employment in a position included in the Employees' Pension System or Teachers' Pension System.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0364
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page