Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Voting Disclosure Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegate McDonough
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a jury commissioner to provide prospective juror information concerning individuals who are not citizens of the United States to the State Board of Elections and the Motor Vehicle Administration within 5 days of receiving the information; requiring the State Administrator of Elections to make specified arrangements to receive the information; requiring the State Administrator to retain a list of individuals whose information has been submitted; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0891 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-504 )
(   16-206.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM