Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Health Departments – Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Reznik
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying the amount of funding required to be included in the State budget for local health services for certain fiscal years; altering the purposes for which local health department funding may be used to include protective equipment for certain health care personnel and materials appropriate to prepare for potential communicable disease emergencies; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to conduct a certain evaluation by December 1, 2021; requiring the Department to submit a certain report by December 15, 2021; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0563
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Health Departments – Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Local Health Departments – Funding
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/1/2021 5:04 PM
Click to return on the top page