Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Dangerous or Wild Animals
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Barkley, Barnes, Bobo, Cardin, Carr, DeBoy, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Healey, Hixson, Hucker, Kach, A. Kelly, Kramer, Malone, McIntosh, McMillan, Mizeur, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Stein, Tarrant, F. Turner, Waldstreicher, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the list of entities and individuals to which specified provisions relating to dangerous or wild animals, including a prohibition on importing, offering for sale, trading, bartering, possessing, breeding, or exchanging specified animals, do not apply; authorizing holders of a specified federal exhibitor's license to possess or breed specified animals if specified conditions are met; requiring a local animal control authority to take specified steps to find long-term placement of specified seized animals; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {320418/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {320418/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Special Order until next session (Delegate Eckardt) Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/28/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-621 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM