Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - MobilityLink - Free Rides for Elected Officials
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to allow State and local elected officials to use MobilityLink free of charge.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - MobilityLink - Free Rides for Elected Officials
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM