Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson, Barkley, Bates, Costa, Davis, Guzzone, Hershey, Hixson, Howard, Impallaria, W. Miller, and Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified notice procedures required to enforce a lien on specified property stored in a leased space at a self-service storage facility; providing that a specified sale held on an online auction Web site to enforce a specified lien shall be deemed to be held at a specified location; altering the required means of delivery of specified notices; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0634
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {863897/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {863897/1 Report Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/25/2013 3/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 55
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Finance 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (41-6) 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-501, 18-503, 18-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM