Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Water Quality Certifications – Requests (Water Quality Certification Improvement Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Gilchrist, Fraser-Hidalgo, Korman, Stein, Stewart, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person seeking a certain water quality certification to submit a request to the Department of the Environment; requiring that a request for a water quality certification include certain information concerning the potential environmental impacts of certain projects; requiring the Department to begin reviewing a request immediately on receipt of the request; requiring the Department to issue a decision on a request in accordance with the timeline for environmental review provided under the federal Clean Water Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment – Water Quality Certifications – Requests (Water Quality Certification Improvement Act)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   9-353 through 9-357 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page