Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Participant Compensation
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Bobo, Frick, Frush, Gutierrez, Hucker, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lee, Mizeur, Stukes, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to award specified reasonable fees and costs of preparation for and participation in a hearing or proceeding before the Commission to specified customers under specified circumstances; requiring a customer that intends to seek a specified award to file and submit to all parties of the hearing or proceeding a notice of intent to claim compensation at a specified time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-301 through 3-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM