Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Afzali, Bates, Boteler, Cluster, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Hough, Jacobs, Kipke, McDermott, McMillan, Myers, Norman, Otto, Ready, Schuh, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Stocksdale, Szeliga, and Vitale
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from personal property tax for property that is owned by a business that has organized under the laws of Maryland during the current tax year or that relocates its headquarters to Maryland during the current tax year; exempting all personal property other than operating personal property of a railroad or public utility from a property tax imposed by a county or municipality for all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0856 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014, June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-245, 7-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM