Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell and Dumais
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified action to be brought to establish title against adverse claims to property; providing for jurisdiction, venue, and the application of specified statutes and rules in an action under the Act; requiring a specified notice to be sent to specified holders of security interests; requiring the filing of a specified affidavit acknowledging that the plaintiff sent specified notices; establishing that an action is commenced by filing a complaint; establishing requirements for a complaint; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0837
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {540313/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {540313/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-108, 14-601 through 14-628 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM