Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Campaign Contributions – Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Ivey, Moon, Acevero, Korman, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting persons other than individuals or campaign finance entities from directly or indirectly making contributions to campaign finance entities.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Campaign Contributions – Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law – Campaign Contributions – Prohibition
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-226, 13-236, 13-236.1, 13-237 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM