Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Expansion of Participating Units
Sponsored by
Delegate Morhaim
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, on the termination of any health benefits contract that exists on July 1, 2018, a county, municipal corporation, or county board must enroll and participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; requiring the Program to encompass all units in all county governments, municipal corporations, and county boards; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to adopt certain regulations specifying certain employees who are eligible to participate in the Program with certain subsidies; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1016
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Expansion of Participating Units
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-501, 2-502, 2-503, 2-507, 2-512, 2-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM