Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB1131


CH0430

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Limited Fishing Guide License - Propulsion of Boats and Vessels
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz and Adams
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 430
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a boat or vessel used under a limited fishing guide license may be propelled by human power.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0793
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 430
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natural Resources - Limited Fishing Guide License - Propulsion of Boats and Vessels
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43A
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Limited Fishing Guide License - Propulsion of Boats and Vessels
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 430
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:17 PM