Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Budget and Funding PG 308-16
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the County Executive and County Council of Prince George's County to recognize and categorize the Board of License Commissioners of Prince George's County as a public safety agency for budgetary purposes; authorizing the County Council to include in the budget a maximum of $50,000 to maintain software and mobile devices used to modernize practices and increase the efficiency and transparency of the Board; requiring the County Executive and County Council to establish a specified fund for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {213994/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Favorable with Amendments {213994/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-204, 15-109 )
(   26-205, 26-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM