Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy - Offshore Wind Projects - Distance Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Carozza, S. Howard, Jacobs, W. Miller, and Otto
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering from between 10 to 30 to not less than 26 nautical miles the distances required of certain qualified offshore wind projects from the State shoreline; prohibiting the Public Service Commission from approving certain offshore wind projects unless certain wind turbines are installed; requiring certain wind turbines to be installed in a certain manner for certain purposes; excluding from the calculation of certain ORECs the generation or capacity of certain wind turbines; requiring the Commission to enter a certain order; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1058
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy - Offshore Wind Projects - Distance Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Renewable Energy - Offshore Wind Projects - Distance Requirements
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-704.1, 7-704.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM