Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Elliott, Frank, and Niemann
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county or municipality to satisfy a requirement to publish legal notices in a newspaper of general circulation by posting the notices on its Web site; requiring notices posted on a county or municipality Web site to be conspicuously displayed and be easily accessible; requiring a county or municipality that chooses to post notices on the Internet to publish specified advance notice in a newspaper of general circulation in the county or municipality and to offer a specified mail service; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0523
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1355 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM