Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses - Hours of Sale
Sponsored by
Delegates Ali, Oaks, and Rosenberg
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying 9 a.m. to 9 p.m. as the hours of sale for a holder of a Class B-D-7 beer, wine, and liquor license in a specified area of Baltimore City; prohibiting the hours of sale for a license holder in a specified area from beginning before or ending after specified times; and prohibiting the hours of sale from being extended under specified conditions.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1153
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {533325/1 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses - Hours of Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses - Hours of Sale
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 Licenses - Hours of Sale
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 Licenses - Hours of Sale
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {533325/1 (Senator Conway) Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses - Hours of Sale
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses - Hours of Sale
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-2005, 12-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM