Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Reduction of Fees
Sponsored by
Delegates Olszewski and Kach
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified counties and municipalities to establish specified policies and procedures to reduce a stormwater remediation fee for both residential and nonresidential property owners; and requiring specified policies and procedures to include fee reductions of 25%, 50%, 75%, and 100%.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM