Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Ali, Branch, Clippinger, Conaway, Gibson, Hayes, R. Lewis, McIntosh, Mosby, and Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to refuse to register or reregister, or suspend the registration of, a motor vehicle for which the person liable for a violation recorded by a vehicle height monitoring system has failed to pay the civil penalty, contest liability, or appear for trial; prohibiting a certain violation from being recorded on the driving record of any person; requiring Baltimore City and the District Court to provide a certain delinquency notice to the State Highway Administration; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018, December 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {880714/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-6)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – Enforcement
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {880714/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – Enforcement
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-6) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-101, 24-111.3, 26-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM