Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Carr, Chang, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Hettleman, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Lam, Luedtke, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Reznik, Robinson, Sample-Hughes, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of State Police to create and operate a specified statewide sexual assault evidence collection kit tracking system; authorizing the State Police to contract with specified entities for specified purposes; providing requirements for a specified tracking system; authorizing the State Police to use a specified implementation process and to submit a report on the status and plan for launching the system to the General Assembly by January 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1094
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - Requirements
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-926, 11-927 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM