Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Qualified Maryland Housing Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington and Bridges
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for certain qualified Maryland housing in certain areas; providing for allocation of the aggregate available credit amount among qualified Maryland housing projects by the Secretary of Housing and Community Development; making the credit refundable; requiring the Secretary to report to the General Assembly by December 31 each year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0723 Session: 2006 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Qualified Maryland Housing Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Qualified Maryland Housing Tax Credit
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-2501 through 4-2504 )
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM