Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsored by
Delegates Clagett, Beitzel, Bohanan, DeBoy, Eckardt, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Olszewski, B. Robinson, Rudolph, Schulz, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Wood, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing, beginning after December 31, 2013, but before January 1, 2019, the State income tax rate on the Maryland taxable income of corporations that incorporate in or relocate to the State on or after January 1, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/07/2014 Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM