Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Pimlico Historic Preservation Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Carter, and Oaks
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Pimlico Historic Preservation Commission; requiring that a specified grant from the Racetrack Facility Renewal Account and made available to Pimlico Race Course be used for specified purposes; specifying the membership of the Commission; requiring that the Governor and Mayor of Baltimore City appoint specified members; providing for the term of a member; specifying that a member is entitled to the reimbursement of specified expenses; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-29, 9-1A-29.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM