Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Types of Prohibited Actions
Sponsored by
Delegates Frush, Bobo, Braveboy, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glenn, and Hucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the types of actions that a landlord of residential property may not take to include refusing to renew a lease for specified reasons under specified provisions of landlord-tenant law concerning retaliatory actions.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0799
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-208.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM