Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Tenured Faculty, Adjunct Faculty, and Graduate Student Employees
Sponsored by
Delegates Acevero, Crutchfield, W. Fisher, Haynes, Ivey, Lehman, R. Lewis, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Solomon, Stewart, Sydnor, Wells, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing collective bargaining rights to certain tenured or tenure-track faculty, adjunct faculty, and graduate student employees at certain public institutions of higher education; altering certain exceptions to the applicability of provisions of law governing collective bargaining for State employees; establishing separate collective bargaining units for certain tenured or tenure-track faculty, adjunct faculty, and graduate student employees; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Tenured Faculty, Adjunct Faculty, and Graduate Student Employees
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101, 3-102, 3-403, 3-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM