Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Jackson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing members of the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to make a certain designation in writing; repealing the requirement for the Commission to elect a chair; requiring that the Secretary of State Police serve as the chair of the Commission; requiring the Commission to conduct a certain job task analysis once every 10 years, beginning in 2020; specifying the duties of the Commission in regards to the training of police officers in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {452118/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {452118/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51AClick to view Recorded Media
(   3-201, 3-202, 3-203, 3-204, 3-207, 3-209, 3-209.1, 3-210, 3-211, 3-212, 3-213, 3-214, 3-215, 3-216 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page