Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Frush, B. Barnes, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the State Board of Tree Experts in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing for the composition of the Board and the qualifications, appointments, removal, terms, and expenses of the Board members; requiring the Board to adopt a code of ethics for practicing as a tree expert; prohibiting a person from practicing as a tree expert in the State without a license issued by the Board, subject to specified exceptions; establishing specified qualifications for a license; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0903
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015, October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/19/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
(   22-101 through 22-502, 22-304 )
(   5-415 through 5-423 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page