Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Incentive Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, Morales, Atterbeary, Barkley, Ebersole, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hill, Hixson, Kaiser, Kelly, Lam, A. Miller, Moon, Pendergrass, Platt, and Reznik
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending a specified credit against the State income tax for electricity produced by specified facilities from specified qualified energy resources to be certified on or before December 31, 2018; and extending the period in which the Maryland Energy Administration may issue specified qualifying certifications.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0936
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-37)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {769839/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (99-37) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {769839/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 61
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-720 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM