Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Fixed Charges for Taxicab Services - Baltimore City
Sponsored by
Delegates McHale, Clippinger, Hammen, and Olszewski
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a taxicab permit holder to make a fixed charge for any trip by taxicab between specified locations in Baltimore City or between points within Baltimore City as approved by the Public Service Commission; and requiring that a fixed charge made under the Act be calculated on a mileage basis approved by the Commission.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0356
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 36
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 36
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 38
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Finance 37
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 56
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM