Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education Members - Term Limitation and Referendum
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a voting member of the Carroll County Board of Education from serving on the board for more than two consecutive terms; and submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of Carroll County.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {505069/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154038/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {505069/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {154038/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 61
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM