Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Traffic Control Signal Modernization Fund – Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Parrott
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the District Court to impose certain additional court costs on a defendant convicted of or found liable for certain violations of the Maryland Vehicle Law; establishing the Traffic Control Signal Modernization Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund to finance the modernization of traffic control signals; requiring the State Highway Administration to develop and implement a certain plan for modernizing traffic control signals in the State on or before December 31 2028; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Traffic Control Signal Modernization Fund – Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Traffic Control Signal Modernization Fund – Establishment
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:23 PM
Click to return on the top page