Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Certified Nurse-Midwives - Standards and Practice Guidelines
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Kelly, Beidle, Cullison, George, Gutierrez, Hogan, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Kach, Kaiser, Kipke, Krebs, Luedtke, Mizeur, Parrott, Pena-Melnyk, S. Robinson, Stein, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Board of Nursing from requiring certified nurse-midwives to have written documentation of consultation, collaboration, or referral with another health care practitioner as a condition of licensure; requiring certified nurse-midwives to comply with specified standards established by the American College of Nurse-Midwives or other specified organizations; and authorizing the Board, in the course of an investigation, to require a certified nurse-midwife to provide a copy of specified practice guidelines.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0760
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2013 3/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM