Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Abortion - 24-Hour Waiting Period
Sponsored by
Delegates Cox, Arikan, Boteler, Impallaria, Long, McComas, Otto, Parrott, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a physician from performing or inducing an abortion on a woman before 24 hours have elapsed since the woman requested that the physician perform an abortion except under certain circumstances; prohibiting a claim or diagnosis that a woman will engage in conduct which she intends to result in her death or bodily injury to herself from being the basis of a certain certification; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Abortion - 24-Hour Waiting Period
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Abortion - 24-Hour Waiting Period
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM