Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interstate Human Trafficking of Minors Prohibition Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Cox, Boteler, and Impallaria
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that certain persons who are required to provide certain notice or make certain reports of suspected child pregnancy as required by the Act may not knowingly fail to give the notice or make the report; providing certain penalties for a violation of a certain provision of the Act; prohibiting a person from bringing or causing another to bring a minor into the State to commit certain violations of the law prohibiting human trafficking; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Interstate Human Trafficking of Minors Prohibition Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Interstate Human Trafficking of Minors Prohibition Act
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-303, 3-602.2 )
(   11-1008, 11-816.1 )
(   5-705.5 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM