Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Policies
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hornberger, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Shetty, and Solomon
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a public school to notify a student's parent or legal guardian when there is a low balance in the student's meal account and before the student accrues unpaid meal debt; prohibiting a public school from communicating about unpaid meal debt directly with a student or in any way that embarrasses or humiliates the student; prohibiting a public school from taking certain actions in response to a student's unpaid meal debt; requiring certain notice about the application process and requirements for certain meal programs; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Policies
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Policies
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Policies
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Policies
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-125 )
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 6:09 PM