Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – Mathematics Credit – College Preparatory Computer Science or Computer Programming Course
Sponsored by
Delegates Rose, Mosby, D. Barnes, Barron, Boteler, Buckel, Cain, Gilchrist, Griffith, Hornberger, Korman, Krebs, McKay, Palakovich Carr, Shoemaker, and Stein
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a student who is enrolled at a public high school to satisfy a certain requirement to earn credits in mathematics by completing a credit in a certain college preparatory computer science or computer programming course selected by the county board; and requiring the county board to certify to the State Department of Education that the computer science or computer programming course may count toward the mathematics graduation requirement.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0892
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {635764/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-5)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools – Mathematics Credit – Computer Science or Computer Programming Course
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {635764/1 Adopted 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Public Schools – Mathematics Credit – College Preparatory Computer Science or Computer Programming Course
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (127-5) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51A
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   7-209 )
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:32 AM