Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, D. Barnes, Barve, Brooks, Carr, Conaway, Ebersole, Fennell, Glenn, Haynes, Hettleman, Jalisi, Jones, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Patterson, Platt, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, Sydnor, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that specified manufacturers of lead pigment are liable to specified persons for damages caused by lead-based paint; establishing the types of damages caused by the presence of lead-based paint in residential buildings for which manufacturers of lead pigment are liable to specified persons; creating the Lead Paint Restitution Fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0951
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1134 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/11/2016 Text - First - Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2101 through 3-2109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM