Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Gutierrez, Rose, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for income from the discharge of indebtedness related to specified costs incurred with respect to a principal residence; providing that the subtraction may not exceed $100,000 for an individual and $200,000 for a married couple filing jointly or specified individuals; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016, but before January 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0367
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0923 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Referred Rules 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
(   10-205, 10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page