Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Automatic Recurring Payments
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain merchants that enroll consumers in certain automatic recurring payments for certain goods or services provided or sold over the Internet to include a link to a web page that allows a consumer to cancel the contract; requiring certain merchants that enroll consumers in certain automatic recurring payments for certain goods or services provided or sold over the Internet, by mail, or over the telephone to provide a consumer a certain form and present recurring automatic payment terms in a clear and conspicuous manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Automatic Recurring Payments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Automatic Recurring Payments
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101, 14-1321 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:22 PM