Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Contributory Negligence Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Clagett, Cluster, Frank, Hough, K. Kelly, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, W. Miller, Minnick, Myers, Parrott, Rudolph, and Schulz
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the common law doctrine of contributory negligence, as it existed under its judicially determined meaning on January 1, 2011, shall remain an affirmative defense that may be raised by a party under specified circumstances; and making the Act contingent on specified action taken by the Court of Appeals of Maryland.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0819
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2013 Text - First - Maryland Contributory Negligence Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM