Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners - Practice of Chiropractic or Massage Therapy - Penalties and Exemptions
Sponsored by
Delegate Hubbard
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified persons from knowingly recruiting, persuading, inducing, enticing, or encouraging a person to practice or attempt to practice massage therapy without a license; altering the amount of specified penalties relating to the practice of chiropractic or massage therapy without a license; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0817
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014, October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2014 3/11/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-501, 3-506, 3-5A-01, 3-5A-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM