Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Consumer Debt Collection - Disclosure Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Hucker, Barkley, and Vaughn
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring collectors of specified debt to disclose in writing specified information in any communication to the debtor relating to the alleged debt; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0432
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703993/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-32)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {703993/1 Report Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/25/2013 3/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (106-32) 55
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Finance 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM