Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Comprehensive Dental Benefits for Adults - Authorization
Sponsored by
Delegates McKay, B. Barnes, Beitzel, Carozza, Chang, Ciliberti, Ghrist, Grammer, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, Jackson, Jones, Korman, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, McConkey, McIntosh, A. Miller, Reznik, Sophocleus, Valentino-Smith, Vogt, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, beginning on January 1, 2019, and subject to specified limitations, to provide comprehensive dental services for adults whose annual household income is at or below 133 percent of the poverty level.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Comprehensive Dental Benefits for Adults - Authorization
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM