Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Companies - Service Restoration - Special Medical Needs Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Arora, Barkley, Bobo, Carr, Dumais, Luedtke, McDonough, Mizeur, Simmons, and Wood
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a requirement that the Public Service Commission, on or before September 1 of each year, determine whether specified electric companies have met specified service quality and reliability standards; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish and distribute to each electric company a list of specified special medical needs facilities, including the licensed capacity of each facility, by January 1 of each year and post the list on the Department's Web site; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {503590/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-20)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {137878/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-18)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {503590/2 Report Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (117-20) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Finance 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable with Amendments {137878/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 62
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (114-18) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-302, 7-213, 7-213.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM