Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan and Commission - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Boyce, Bartlett, Bridges, Feldmark, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Rosenberg, Smith, Stein, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration, on or before October 1, 2021, to prepare corridor studies for at least three corridors prioritized in the Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan as early opportunity corridors; requiring the Administration to publish a progress report on the implementation of the Plan; requiring the corridor studies and progress report to include certain information and be completed by certain dates; requiring the Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan Commission to meet at certain intervals; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan and Commission - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan and Commission - Alterations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 9:36 AM