Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - School Supplies
Sponsored by
Delegate Thiam
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for up to $250 of expenses paid or incurred by a parent or guardian of a student in kindergarten through grade 12 during taxable years 2020 and 2021 for certain school supplies used by the student; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2022.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - School Supplies
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - School Supplies
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:23 PM
Click to return on the top page