Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Luxury Surcharge
Sponsored by
Delegate Hixson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Imposing a surcharge on retail sales or use of tangible personal property if the taxable price of specified items exceeds specified amounts; exempting specified sales from the surcharge; providing for the amount of the surcharge based on the taxable price of specified items; increasing the thresholds for the amount of the surcharge every fifth taxable year by a specified cost-of-living adjustment; providing that specified exemptions under the sales and use tax do not apply to the surcharge; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1345 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2013 Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Luxury Surcharge
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 11-102, 11-104, 11-221 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM