Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Registration – Exemption From Registration Fees – Surviving Spouses of Veterans
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Cluster, Glass, Jalisi, Knotts, Lisanti, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the surviving spouse of a deceased disabled veteran be at least 65 years old to qualify for a certain exemption to vehicle registration fees.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0626
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Registration – Exemption From Registration Fees – Surviving Spouses of Veterans
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Vehicle Registration – Exemption From Registration Fees – Surviving Spouses of Veterans
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0) 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Registration – Exemption From Registration Fees – Surviving Spouses of Veterans
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM