Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Contribution to a Candidate for Judicial Office
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel and McKay
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an individual who makes a contribution to a campaign finance entity of a candidate for a judicial office and the candidate is elected as judge, or who makes a contribution to a campaign finance entity established by another person to support a candidate for a judicial office and the candidate is elected as judge, may not appear as an attorney of record or be a party in any matter before that judge for a specified period of time.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-244 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM